Global Patent Index - EP 1200715 B1

EP 1200715 B1 2004-12-08 - METHOD FOR REGULATING THE REGENERATION OF A STORAGE CATALYST LOCATED IN AN EXHAUST GAS CHANNEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING THE REGENERATION OF A STORAGE CATALYST LOCATED IN AN EXHAUST GAS CHANNEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINER REGENERATION EINES IN EINEM ABGASKANAL EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE ANGEORDNETEN SPEICHERKATALYSATORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE LA REGENERATION D'UN CATALYSEUR A ACCUMULATION PLACE DANS UN CANAL DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1200715 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00943972 A

Priority

  • DE 19932301 A
  • EP 0006190 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19932301A1] The invention relates to a method for regulating the regeneration of a storage catalyst located in an exhaust gas channel of an internal combustion engine. Means for setting a work mode by at least temporarily influencing at least one operating parameter of the internal combustion engine are allocated to said internal combustion engine and the internal combustion engine is set in a work mode with lambda </= 1 (regeneration mode) for the regeneration of the storage catalyst. The invention also provides that the regeneration mode of the internal combustion engine (16) is started and/or maintained in accordance with a speed of the internal combustion engine (16) and/or a requested load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19932301 A1 20010111; EP 1200715 A1 20020502; EP 1200715 B1 20041208; WO 0104468 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008915 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI