Global Patent Index - EP 1201729 A3

EP 1201729 A3 2002-11-20 - Fluid catalytic cracking regenerator with reduced NOx emissions

Title (en)

Fluid catalytic cracking regenerator with reduced NOx emissions

Title (de)

Katalytischer Krackregenerator in der Flüssigphase mit reduzierter Emission von NOx

Title (fr)

Régénérateur de craquage catalytique en lit fluidisé avec une émission réduite de NOx

Publication

EP 1201729 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01309166 A

Priority

US 70297500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1201729A2] A method for inhibiting the formation of nitrogen oxides in a carbon monoxide boiler 22 using fuel gas to burn the carbon monoxide downstream of an FCC regenerator 2 by introducing an oxygen-enriched gas into the boiler 22. Preferably, a nitrogen-enriched gas is simultaneously added to the boiler which further reduces the formation of nitrogen oxides. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/185 (2013.01); C10G 11/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1201729 A2 20020502; EP 1201729 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI