Global Patent Index - EP 1201820 A3

EP 1201820 A3 2002-11-20 - Pressing arrangement

Title (en)

Pressing arrangement

Title (de)

Pressenanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage

Publication

EP 1201820 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01117421 A

Priority

DE 10053935 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1201820A2] The press section (16), to extract water from a wet paper or cardboard web (14) at a production machine, has at least two roller press gaps (S1,S2) for the web to pass through. The gaps are formed by two separate roller presses (18,20) without a central roller, and without a common blanket. In the direction (L) of web travel, the web is carried through the first roller press gap (S1) with two blankets, where the upper roller is a suction pick-up roller (22), and the lower roller (24) acts as a counter roller. The upper blanket (26) carries the web around the upper suction roller. The counter roller is a self-loading bending compensation roller. The second press station (20) is a shoe press assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1201820 A2 20020502; EP 1201820 A3 20021120; DE 10053935 A1 20020508; US 2002050330 A1 20020502; US 6521093 B2 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060110

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI