Global Patent Index - EP 1201992 A3

EP 1201992 A3 2002-09-25 - Burner plate for gas burner

Title (en)

Burner plate for gas burner

Title (de)

Brennerplatte für einen Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Plaque de brûleur pour brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 1201992 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01125298 A

Priority

DE 10053876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1201992A2] The mixer body (12) is sealed by a burner-plate (15) which has mixture outlets in and which has at least one mixer-pipe which is supplied via gas-nozzles and air-inlets with a mixture of burner gas and air. The burner plate has hooks (40) which , when the burner plate is mounted, grip behind part (32) of the housing of the mixer body. The hooks are in the form of sprung metal strips (41) curved towards the mixer body and formed from part (37) of the wall of the burner plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/08; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/08 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23D 14/08 (2013.01); F23D 2213/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1201992 A2 20020502; EP 1201992 A3 20020925; DE 10053876 A1 20020516; DE 10053876 C2 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060920

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEHL, ALBIN, DR.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWESING, MANFRED

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEBOWSKI, DOBROMIL

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISCHER, RALF

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PORZER, VOLKER

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEMKE, HELMUT

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTERT, MARKUS

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI