Global Patent Index - EP 1204327 A4

EP 1204327 A4 2003-06-11 - PROCESS FOR REMOVAL OF UNDESIRED FLAVOR FROM ENZYME-HYDROLYZED OAT BRAN AND THE RESULTING PRODUCT

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR REMOVAL OF UNDESIRED FLAVOR FROM ENZYME-HYDROLYZED OAT BRAN AND THE RESULTING PRODUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON UNERWUENSCHTEM GERUCH AUS ENZYM-HYDROLYSIERTER HAFERKLEIE UND DAS ERHALTENE PRODUKT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE LA SAVEUR INDESIRABLE DU SON D'AVOINE A HYDROLYSE ENZYMATIQUE ET PRODUIT OBTENU

Publication

EP 1204327 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00955288 A

Priority

  • US 0020781 W
  • US 14924699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0111976A1] A process for removing flavor from hydrolyzed oat bran which comprises extracting the hydrolyzed oat bran with a lower alkanol until the oat bran is free of oat taste (34). The corresponding processing of soy flour is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23B 5/12; A23B 5/14; A23B 5/18; A23L 1/015; A23L 1/10; A23L 1/105; B01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 5/20 (2016.01); A23L 7/10 (2016.01); A23L 7/104 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 7/107 (2016.08); A23L 5/23 (2016.08); A23L 7/115 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0111976 A1 20010222; AU 6751300 A 20010313; EP 1204327 A1 20020515; EP 1204327 A4 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23B 5/12 A

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23B 5/14 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23B 5/18 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 1/015 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 11/00 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 1/10 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 1/105 B

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI