Global Patent Index - EP 1204742 A2

EP 1204742 A2 2002-05-15 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR INHIBITING THE EXPRESSION OF HUMAN EG5

Title (en)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR INHIBITING THE EXPRESSION OF HUMAN EG5

Title (de)

OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR INHIBIERUNG DER EXPRESSION VON HUMANEM EG5

Title (fr)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES PERMETTANT D'INHIBER L'EXPRESSION DE LA PROTEINE EG5 HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1204742 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00953119 A

Priority

  • DE 19935303 A
  • EP 0007345 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19935303A1] The invention relates to an oligonucleotide or one of its derivatives that is characterized by a sequence that corresponds to a nucleotide sequence that encodes a defined part of human eg5 or a mutated form thereof. The invention further relates to a method of producing said oligonucleotide and to its use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/11; A61K 31/7125; C07H 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 31/7115 (2006.01); A61K 31/712 (2006.01); A61K 31/7125 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/113 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07B 2200/11 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/317 (2013.01); C12N 2310/318 (2013.01); C12N 2310/32 (2013.01); C12N 2310/33 (2013.01); C12N 2310/346 (2013.01); Y02A 50/411 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0107602A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19935303 A1 20010208; AR 024953 A1 20021030; AU 6568200 A 20010213; BR 0013180 A 20020409; CA 2380192 A1 20010201; CN 1165617 C 20040908; CN 1367828 A 20020904; CZ 20020324 A3 20020515; EE 200200044 A 20030616; EP 1204742 A2 20020515; HK 1048337 A1 20050225; HR P20020075 A2 20051031; HU 0202794 A2 20030328; HU 0202794 A3 20060328; IL 147541 D0 20020814; JP 2003505080 A 20030212; MX PA02000817 A 20020730; NO 20020365 A 20020325; NO 20020365 D0 20020123; NZ 516839 A 20040430; PL 353733 A1 20031201; RU 2249458 C2 20050410; SK 1162002 A3 20020604; TR 200200201 T2 20020521; US 6472521 B1 20021029; WO 0107602 A2 20010201; WO 0107602 A3 20010517; YU 91901 A 20030228; ZA 200200655 B 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060127

2005-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UHLMANN, EUGEN

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GREINER, BEATE

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UNGER, EBERHARD

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOTHE, GISLINDE

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHWERDEL, MARC

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020228;LT PAYMENT 20020228;LV PAYMENT 20020228;MK PAYMENT 20020228;RO PAYMENT 20020228;SI PAYMENT 20020228