Global Patent Index - EP 1204909 A4

EP 1204909 A4 2002-11-05 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELLING AND PURCHASING MEDIA ADVERTISING OVER A DISTRIBUTED COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELLING AND PURCHASING MEDIA ADVERTISING OVER A DISTRIBUTED COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR VERKAUF UND ANKAUF VON MEDIA WERBUNG ÜBER EIN VERTEILTES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEM DE VENTE ET D'ACHAT DE PUBLICITE-MEDIAS SUR UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION REPARTI

Publication

EP 1204909 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00950744 A

Priority

  • US 0020389 W
  • US 36186099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0107985A2] A method and system for buying (103) and selling (102) media advertising opportunities over a distributed communication network (104), such as the Internet, provides a server on network including a database (105) containing information pertaining to available advertising opportunities, such as advertising time slots in television programming schedules, provided by media content providers. The server provides buyers of the advertising opportunities access to the database over the network, whereby buyers may search the database and make offers to the sellers for selected advertising opportunities. Sellers of advertising opportunities access the database over the network to enter the information, receive bids entered by buyers, accept bids, and enter contracts into the server for communication to buyers over the network.

[origin: WO0107985A2] A method and system for buying and selling media advertising opportunities over a distributed communication network, such as the Internet, provides a server on network including a database containing information pertaining to available advertising opportunities, such as advertising time slots in television programming schedules, provided by media content providers. The server provides buyers of the advertising opportunities access to the database over the network, whereby buyers may search the database and make offers to the sellers for selected advertising opportunities. Sellers of advertising opportunities access the database over the network to enter the information, receive bids entered by buyers, accept bids, and enter contracts into the server for communication to buyers over the network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/812 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9605563 A1 19960222 - REUTERS LTD [GB]
  • [A] US 5621734 A 19970415 - MANN BRUCE E [US], et al
  • [A] US 5737533 A 19980407 - DE HOND MAURICE [NL]
  • [A] US 5227778 A 19930713 - VACON GARY V [US], et al
  • [X] "RADIO TURNS TO INTERNET TO BOOST ADVERTISING", FINANCIAL TIMES, FINANCIAL TIMES, LONDON,, GB, 4 November 1998 (1998-11-04), pages 1 - 4, XP002936463, ISSN: 0307-1766
  • [X] WANG N: "AUCTIONING OF AD SPACE GETS BOOST WITH SUCCESSFUL LAUNCH OF SITE", INTERNET WORLD, MECKLERMEDIA, WESTPORT, CT, US, 2 March 1996 (1996-03-02), pages 14, XP002936464, ISSN: 1081-3071
  • See also references of WO 0107985A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0107985 A2 20010201; WO 0107985 A3 20010426; WO 0107985 A9 20020801; EP 1204909 A2 20020515; EP 1204909 A4 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 1/00 A, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2002-11-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE