Global Patent Index - EP 1205122 A3

EP 1205122 A3 2003-06-04 - Fastening lever, particularly for sports shoes

Title (en)

Fastening lever, particularly for sports shoes

Title (de)

Hebelverschluss, insbesondere für Sportschuhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation à levier, en particulier pour chaussures de sport

Publication

EP 1205122 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01124572 A

Priority

  • IT MI20002404 A
  • IT MI20002406 A
  • IT MI20002405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1205122A2] A fastening lever for sports shoes comprising a first flap to be joined to a second flap. The fastening lever has a base associated with the first flap and a lever arm articulated to the base; a traction member is pivoted to the lever arm and bears a bridge which has a pivot which can be selectively associated with one of a plurality of teeth of a rack associated with the second flap. The lever arm can be actuated in order to join the flaps with a selected closure force. The fastening lever comprises a preloaded elastically deformable member provided with a load adjustment means and operating between the base and the lever arm in order to keep the closure force constant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/1406 (2013.01); A43C 11/1433 (2013.01); A43C 11/1453 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1205122 A2 20020515; EP 1205122 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEAD TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HTM SPORT S.P.A.

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI