Global Patent Index - EP 1205667 A3

EP 1205667 A3 2002-11-20 - Gas friction pump

Title (en)

Gas friction pump

Title (de)

Gasreibungspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à effet visqueux

Publication

EP 1205667 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01124630 A

Priority

DE 10056144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1205667A2] The gas friction pump comprises a housing (1) with a suction aperture (2) and a gas outlet aperture (3), with rotor (12) and stator (14) components in the housing for feed of gases and the production of a pressure state. On the side of the suction aperture within the housing, a sngle or multi-stage concave pump unit (20) is fitted, which has a gas-conveying structure. The gas-conveying structure is so formed that a gas delivery occurs in a radial direction. The rotor parts (21) of this pump unit and those (12) of the gas friction pump are located on the same rotor shaft (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/046 (2013.01); F04D 17/168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PXL] EP 1128069 A2 20010829 - PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]
  • [X] EP 1041287 A2 20001004 - SEIKO SEIKI KK [JP]
  • [A] WO 9323672 A1 19931125 - LEYBOLD AG [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 02 26 February 1999 (1999-02-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1205667 A2 20020515; EP 1205667 A3 20021120; EP 1205667 B1 20090114; DE 10056144 A1 20020523; DE 50114655 D1 20090305; JP 2002180989 A 20020626; JP 4183409 B2 20081119; US 2002064451 A1 20020530; US 6638010 B2 20031028

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114655 P 20090305

2009-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080422

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI