Global Patent Index - EP 1206008 B1

EP 1206008 B1 2004-12-15 - Connector to connect electrical lines to an electrical device, in particular for a motor

Title (en)

Connector to connect electrical lines to an electrical device, in particular for a motor

Title (de)

Steckverbinder zum Anschliessen elektrischer Leitungen an eine elektrische Vorrichtung, insbesondere einen Motor

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour connecter des lignes électriques à un appareil électrique, en particulier pour un moteur

Publication

EP 1206008 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01123694 A

Priority

DE 10055309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1206008A2] The connector has a cover (30) for attachment to a housing (41) of the electrical device (40) and at least one plug pin (20) for insertion into an opening in the cover and reversible attachment to the cover in an end position. The rear end of the pin is for connection to the lead (10) and the leading end contacts a contact area (42) in the housing in the end position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187; H01R 13/17; H02K 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1206008 A2 20020515; EP 1206008 A3 20021023; EP 1206008 B1 20041215; ES 2233545 T3 20050616

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50104823

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2011-03-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110323

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233545 T3

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104823 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/187 A, 7H 02K 5/22 B, 7H 01R 13/17 B

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI