Global Patent Index - EP 1207221 A4

EP 1207221 A4 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR ELECTROLYTIC COLORING OF ALUMINUM MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ELECTROLYTIC COLORING OF ALUMINUM MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN BESCHICHTUNG VON ALUMINIUMMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COLORATION ELECTROLYTIQUE D'UN MATERIAU EN ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1207221 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00939163 A

Priority

  • JP 0004179 W
  • JP 17956399 A
  • JP 17956499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1207221A1] This invention relates to an improvement of a process for electrolytically coloring an aluminum material comprising immersing an aluminum material consisting of anodized aluminum or an anodized aluminum alloy in an electrolytic coloring bath containing a soluble metal salt, performing a pretreatment prior to coloring by passing a direct current waveform with said aluminum material serving as the anode, and performing alternating current electrolytic coloring in the same electrolytic coloring bath and the improved process comprises performing said pretreatment prior to coloring until the voltage and current respectively reach the preset ultimate values. It is possible to prevent as much as possible an occurrence of irregular coloring not only in one energizing lot but also in different energizing lots and produce an aluminum material colored in a uniform tone stably and readily on a commercial scale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1207221 A1 20020522; EP 1207221 A4 20020911; AU 5430200 A 20010131; CA 2377953 A1 20010104; CN 1200146 C 20050504; CN 1358239 A 20020710; NO 20016306 A 20020215; NO 20016306 D0 20011221; WO 0100904 A1 20010104

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI