Global Patent Index - EP 1207276 A3

EP 1207276 A3 2003-06-11 - Valve system for engine

Title (en)

Valve system for engine

Title (de)

Ventilannordnung in einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Agencement de soupape dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1207276 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01121947 A

Priority

JP 2000349952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1207276A2] The invention provides avalve system for an engine, in which a rocker arm interlocked with an engine valve is supported on a rocker shaft fixedly mounted to a cylinder head in such a manner as to be rockable according to the rotation of a cam shaft, characterized by realizing the reduction in size and weight of the engine. The posture of a rocker shaft (99) is set to have an axial line crossing an axial line of a crank shaft on the projection plane perpendicular to an axial line of a cylinder bore. A rocker arm(101)rockably supported by the rocker shaft(99)is provided with an input arm (101c) extending, on the above projection plane, from the rocker arm (101) to the cam shaft side, and a pull rod (105) reciprocating in the axial direction according to the rotation of the cam shaft is connected to the input arm (101c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/04; F01L 1/12; F01L 1/14; F01L 1/18; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F02B 75/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F01L 1/026 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 1/146 (2013.01); F01L 1/18 (2013.01); F01L 1/26 (2013.01); F02B 75/243 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01); F02B 2275/34 (2013.01); F02F 1/242 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1207276 A2 20020522; EP 1207276 A3 20030611; EP 1207276 B1 20050601; AT 296943 T 20050615; CA 2360101 A1 20020516; CA 2360101 C 20060117; DE 60111160 D1 20050707; DE 60111160 T2 20051020

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-09-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60111160 P 20050707

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/04 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/14 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/18 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/12 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/26 B

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI