Global Patent Index - EP 1207530 A9

EP 1207530 A9 2002-09-11 - Compound bearing assembly for the swing arm of a hard disc drive

Title (en)

Compound bearing assembly for the swing arm of a hard disc drive

Title (de)

Mehrteiliger Lagerzusammenbau für den Schwenkarm eines Festplattenlaufwerks

Title (fr)

Système à palier composé pour bras-support pivotant d'une unité de disque dur

Publication

EP 1207530 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01127085 A

Priority

  • EP 96307656 A
  • JP 30060895 A
  • JP 30060995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771002A2] A compound bearing assembly for a swing arm (13) is disclosed, which comprises a stepped shaft (1) having a larger diameter portion (1a) and a smaller diameter portion (1b), the larger diameter portion (1a) having an inner raceway groove (2a) formed directly in the inner periphery thereof. A sleeve-like outer race ring (5) surrounds the stepped shaft (1) and has a distinct outer race ring (3) provided adjacent one end thereof and also has an outer raceway groove formed directly in the inner periphery of a portion adjacent the outer end thereof. A plurality of balls (4) are provided between the inner raceway groove (2a) and an outer raceway groove (2a) formed in the distinct outer race ring (3). A plurality of other balls (8a) are provided between an inner raceway groove formed in an inner race ring (7a) fitted on the smaller diameter portion (1b) of the stepped shaft (1) and the outer raceway groove (2b) formed directly in the inner periphery of the sleeve-like outer race ring (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 25/04; G11B 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 19/18 (2006.01); F16C 19/54 (2006.01); G11B 5/55 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/5521 (2013.01); F16C 19/18 (2013.01); F16C 19/54 (2013.01); F16C 2370/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771002 A2 19970502; EP 0771002 A3 19980107; EP 0771002 B1 20020529; DE 69621399 D1 20020704; DE 69621399 T2 20021212; EP 1207530 A1 20020522; EP 1207530 A9 20020911; US 6227714 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-05-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 771002