Global Patent Index - EP 1207590 A3

EP 1207590 A3 2003-06-25 - Housing for electrical circuit

Title (en)

Housing for electrical circuit

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine elektrische Schaltung

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour circuit électrique

Publication

EP 1207590 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01126352 A

Priority

DE 10055601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1207590A2] The housing has a first part (I) in which the circuit and at least one electrical connection point (1) for the circuit are arranged and a second part (II) in which at least one connection conductor (2) is arranged for connecting the circuit with an external electrical cable. The connection conductor is spring elastic in the housing part joint area and is pressed against the connection point with the parts fitted together so as to squash it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/24; H01R 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H05K 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/2442 (2013.01); H01R 12/714 (2013.01); H01R 13/2464 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1207590 A2 20020522; EP 1207590 A3 20030625; DE 10055601 A1 20020620

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080531

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI