Global Patent Index - EP 1208892 A9

EP 1208892 A9 2002-09-11 - Radio controlled bicycle

Title (en)

Radio controlled bicycle

Title (de)

Ferngelenktes Fahrrad

Title (fr)

Bicyclette commandée à distance

Publication

EP 1208892 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01309943 A

Priority

US 72306800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1208892A2] A radio controlled bicycle incorporates flywheel technology in addition to a unique disposition of motors, gears and electronics to provide superior stability and mobility during operation. A flywheel (58) is disposed in the crankshaft area of the bike and is separately driven by an motor (44) independent from the drive motor. The independent operation of the flywheel from the drive system of the bicycle provides increased stability at slower speeds and eliminates the need for complex transmission systems between the drive system motor and the flywheel. An action figure having movable joints is preferably releasably attachable to the bike and provides realistic animation during the bike operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 17/16; A63H 30/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/16 (2006.01); A63H 17/21 (2006.01); A63H 17/22 (2006.01); A63H 17/39 (2006.01); A63H 29/20 (2006.01); A63H 30/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/16 (2013.01); A63H 29/20 (2013.01); A63H 30/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1208892 A2 20020529; EP 1208892 A3 20021218; EP 1208892 A9 20020911; AU 756648 B2 20030116; AU 756648 C 20040212; AU 9342001 A 20020530; CN 1357399 A 20020710; JP 2002200368 A 20020716; JP 3429293 B2 20030722; US 2003104758 A1 20030605; US 2004087244 A1 20040506; US 2004198157 A1 20041007; US 6482069 B1 20021119; US 6682394 B2 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63H 17/16 A, 7A 63H 30/04 B, 7A 63H 17/22 B

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI