Global Patent Index - EP 1209131 A3

EP 1209131 A3 2002-11-06 - Fiber forming apparatus having a forehearth with two or more columns of openings

Title (en)

Fiber forming apparatus having a forehearth with two or more columns of openings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Fasern mit Speiservorherd mit zwei oder mehreren Reihen Öffnungen

Title (fr)

Machine de fabrication de fibres comportant un avant-corps equipé d'une ou de plusieurs colonnes d'ouverture

Publication

EP 1209131 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02075440 A

Priority

  • EP 99949885 A
  • US 17502598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0023390A1] An apparatus (10, 100, 200, 300, 400, 500, 600) is provided for supplying molten glass material to one or more bushings (50) or spinners. The apparatus (10, 100, 200, 300, 400, 500, 600) comprises a melter (20, 120, 220, 320, 420, 520, 620), delivery equipment (30, 130, 230, 330, 430, 530, 630) and a forehearth (40, 140a, 140b, 240a, 240b, 340, 440, 540, 640). The melter (20, 120, 220, 320, 420, 520, 620) provides a main stream of molten glass material. The delivery equipment (30, 130, 230, 330, 430, 530, 630) receives the main stream of molten glass material from the melter (20, 120, 220, 320, 420, 520, 620) and transports the stream to a receiving station. The forehearth (40, 140a, 140b, 240a, 240b, 340, 440, 540, 640) defines the receiving station and comprises a receptacle (42, 541) having a length, a width and a height. The receptacle (42, 541) includes two or more columns (46a, 46b, 346a, 346b) of openings (44a, 44b, 344a, 344b, 544, 644) spaced a given distance from one another along the width of the receptacle. Each column (46a, 46b, 346a, 346b) includes at least two openings (44a, 44b, 344a, 344b, 544, 644) through which molten material passes from the receptacle (42, 541) to the bushings (50) or the spinners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/08; C03B 7/02; C03B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 7/02 (2006.01); C03B 37/03 (2006.01); C03B 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/03 (2013.01); C03B 7/02 (2013.01); C03B 37/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0023390 A1 20000427; AU 6266299 A 20000508; BR 9914605 A 20010703; EP 1129042 A1 20010905; EP 1209131 A2 20020529; EP 1209131 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03B 37/08 A, 7C 03B 7/02 B, 7C 03B 37/03 B

2002-05-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1129042

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI