Global Patent Index - EP 1209217 B1

EP 1209217 B1 2009-02-25 - Fuel oils with improved lubricating activity, containing reaction products of fatty acids with short-chained oil-soluble amines

Title (en)

Fuel oils with improved lubricating activity, containing reaction products of fatty acids with short-chained oil-soluble amines

Title (de)

Brennstofföle mit verbesserter Schmierwirkung, enthaltend Umsetzungsprodukte aus Fettsäuren mit kurzkettigen öllöslichen Aminen

Title (fr)

Huiles combustibles à pouvoir lubrifiant amélioré, contenant des produits de réaction d'acides gras avec des amines solubles dans l'huile à chaînes courtes

Publication

EP 1209217 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01126253 A

Priority

DE 10058356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1209217A2] Additives (I) for improving the lubricity of middle distillates with a sulfur content of up to 0.05 wt.% comprise reaction products of 6-50C mono- or di-carboxylic acids and primary, secondary or tertiary amines having a branched alkyl group. Additives (I) for improving the lubricity of middle distillates with a sulfur content of up to 0.05 wt.% comprise reaction products of 6-50C mono- or di-carboxylic acids and primary, secondary or tertiary amines of formula (II): NR<1>R<2>R<3> (II) R<1> = branched 3-18C alkyl; R<2>, R<3> = H, 1-12C alkyl or R<1>. An Independent claim is also included for fuel oils comprising a middle distillate with a sulfur content of up to 0.05 wt.% and (I).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/224 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/222 (2006.01); C10L 10/08 (2006.01); C10L 10/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/08 (2013.01); C10L 1/221 (2013.01); C10L 1/2222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1209217 A2 20020529; EP 1209217 A3 20030709; EP 1209217 B1 20090225; CA 2352705 A1 20020524; DE 10058356 A1 20020606; DE 10058356 B4 20051215; DE 50114727 D1 20090409; JP 2002167587 A 20020611; US 2002095858 A1 20020725; US 6793696 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114727

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114727 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-01-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/04 20060101AFI20080731BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/08 20060101ALI20080731BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/222 20060101ALI20080731BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/224 20060101ALI20080731BHEP

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050809

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050809

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI