Global Patent Index - EP 1209610 A8

EP 1209610 A8 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for determining affinity data between a ligand and a target

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for determining affinity data between a ligand and a target

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Ligand/Ziel-Affinitätsdaten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de détermination de données d'affinité entre une cible et un ligand

Publication

EP 1209610 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 00403326 A

Priority

EP 00403326 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1209610A1] The apparatus includes a calculator for receiving information representative of a target and of a ligand that might interact with the target at a receptor site. The calculator determines an affinity value representative of the association energy between the target and the ligand on the basis of the received information. A comparator delivers data representative of affinity level between the target and the ligand on the basis of the target/ligand affinity value and a selected reference parameter. Independent claims are included for a method of determining affinity data between a ligand and a target, for a method of determining drug resistance, for a method of monitoring a mammal who is becoming resistant to a drug, for a method for discovering a drug and for a method for changing a drug.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/18 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1209610 A1 20020529; EP 1209610 A8 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALENTIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLAIRBIO CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALENTIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI