Global Patent Index - EP 1209767 B1

EP 1209767 B1 2003-06-04 - Plug connection for furniture lamps

Title (en)

Plug connection for furniture lamps

Title (de)

Steckerverbindung für Möbelleuchten

Title (fr)

Ensemble de fiche pour lampes de meubles

Publication

EP 1209767 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01127920 A

Priority

DE 10058615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1209767A2] A pluggable connection for furniture light includes a device socket outlet (1) which has a separating wall between the contact elements. The contact elements of the plug (3) lie inside a cylindrical enveloping surface of the plug housing, and this separating wall extends in the plug-in direction between the contact elements of the plug (3), in which further the separating wall juts up in the plug-in direction relative to a transversely extending plane through the contact points between the contact elements of the device socket outlet (1), on the one side, and the plug (3) on the other side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/04; H01R 24/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 13/53 (2006.01); H01R 24/20 (2011.01); H01R 24/28 (2011.01); H01R 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/28 (2013.01); H01R 24/20 (2013.01); H01R 13/26 (2013.01); H01R 13/53 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1209767 A2 20020529; EP 1209767 A3 20020612; EP 1209767 B1 20030604; AT 242557 T 20030615; DE 10058615 A1 20020529

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100289 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: E-LEKTRA GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTROTECHNISCHE GERAE

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 24/04 A, 7H 01R 24/06 B, 7H 01R 24/04 J, 7H 01R 103:00 J, 7H 01R 24/06 K, 7H 01R 103:00 K

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI