Global Patent Index - EP 1209768 A3

EP 1209768 A3 2003-06-04 - Cable-connection or cable-joint device

Title (en)

Cable-connection or cable-joint device

Title (de)

Kabelanschluss- oder -verbindungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion ou de jonction de câbles

Publication

EP 1209768 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01127083 A

Priority

DE 10058158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1209768A2] A cable connection device has a device joining component or a first cable connecting component and a second cable connection component. A springy retaining- or guard-ring (7) is axially fixed in the union nut (4) and is formed as a single piece with the core receiving- and guide-part (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/59

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2475 (2013.01); H01R 13/59 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1209768 A2 20020529; EP 1209768 A3 20030604; EP 1209768 B1 20040915; ES 2225387 T3 20050316; US 2002079123 A1 20020627; US 6521832 B2 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2015-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150504

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103615

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225387 T3

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103615 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI