Global Patent Index - EP 1210334 A4

EP 1210334 A4 2002-09-25 - PROCESS OF MAKING IMIDAZOLIDINE-2-ONE DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

PROCESS OF MAKING IMIDAZOLIDINE-2-ONE DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IMIDAZOLIN-2-ON DERIVATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DERIVES D'IMIDAZOLIDINE-2-ONE

Publication

EP 1210334 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00947137 A

Priority

  • US 0018691 W
  • US 14311099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0104098A1] The invention relates to the process of making imidazolidine-2-one derivatives comprising the reaction of ephedrine derivatives with urea in the presence of ammonium sulfamate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 233/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] MELNYK, O. ET AL: "Additions Diastéréosélectives d'Alkyl, Alcényl et Allyl Cuprates à des Imides Chirales Insaturées", TETRAHEDRON, vol. 48, no. 5, 1992, pages 841 - 850, XP002207097
  • See also references of WO 0104098A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0104098 A1 20010118; AR 035555 A1 20040616; AU 6079600 A 20010130; CO 5200764 A1 20020927; EP 1210334 A1 20020605; EP 1210334 A4 20020925; JP 2003504357 A 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1046907

2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051125

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 233/32 A

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011218

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI