Global Patent Index - EP 1210747 B1

EP 1210747 B1 2007-10-31 - DEVICE FOR PLUG-CONNECTING ELECTRIC LINES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PLUG-CONNECTING ELECTRIC LINES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM STECKVERBINDEN ELEKTRISCHER LEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION PAR ENFICHAGE DE LIGNES ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1210747 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00962459 A

Priority

  • DE 19943045 A
  • EP 0008795 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0118913A1] The invention relates to a device for plug-connecting a first and second electric line (2, 8; 108). The inventive device comprises a plug element (6) which is assigned to the first line (2) and which has a plug pin (4). The device also comprises a socket element (12) which is assigned to the second line (8; 108), which receives the plug pin (4) in a pin receiver (10; 110), and which electrically contacts the same. Said socket element (12) has a metal strip (14a, 14b; 114a, 114b) which forms the second line (8; 108) and which, on its end facing the plug pin (4), is deformed in a transversal manner with regard to the longitudinal direction thereof while forming the plug receiver (10; 110). Said metal strip is deformed so that the plug pin (4) can be inserted into the plug receiver (10; 110) in a longitudinal direction of the metal strip (14, 16; 116). The invention is characterized in that the metal strip (14a, 14b; 114a, 114b) forms a one-piece plate bar (14) located external to the socket element (12). Electrical and/or electronic components (42, 44) are applied to said plate bar which are electrically connected in an at least partial manner to the metal strip (14a, 14b; 114a, 114b).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/64 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/64 (2013.01); H01R 13/111 (2013.01); H01R 13/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0118913 A1 20010315; AT 377267 T 20071115; DE 19943045 A1 20010405; DE 50014749 D1 20071213; EP 1210747 A1 20020605; EP 1210747 B1 20071031; US 6589084 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110908

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 377267 T

- Effective date: 20110908

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014749

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110908

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-05-26 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100511

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080211

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014749 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE