Global Patent Index - EP 1210880 A8

EP 1210880 A8 2002-09-04 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SUCRALOSE AND APPLICATION THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SUCRALOSE AND APPLICATION THEREOF

Title (de)

SUKRALOSE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT LA SUCRALOSE ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1210880 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 99951111 A

Priority

  • JP 9905962 W
  • JP 30749498 A
  • JP 30749598 A
  • JP 30749798 A
  • JP 30845798 A
  • JP 30845898 A
  • JP 30846098 A
  • JP 30846298 A
  • JP 30846398 A
  • JP 30846798 A
  • JP 30846898 A
  • JP 30847098 A
  • JP 32714098 A
  • JP 32714798 A
  • JP 32715098 A
  • JP 32715398 A
  • JP 32715798 A
  • JP 32716498 A
  • JP 32716598 A
  • JP 32717098 A
  • JP 33394398 A
  • JP 33394498 A
  • JP 33394598 A
  • JP 33394898 A
  • JP 34027498 A
  • JP 35348998 A
  • JP 35349098 A
  • JP 35349298 A
  • JP 35349598 A
  • JP 35349698 A
  • JP 35349898 A
  • JP 35349998 A
  • JP 35350198 A
  • JP 35350398 A
  • JP 35350498 A
  • JP 35350598 A
  • JP 35350798 A
  • JP 1698499 A
  • JP 1698999 A
  • JP 1699699 A
  • JP 15851199 A
  • JP 15852399 A
  • JP 15852999 A
  • JP 15853699 A
  • JP 15854399 A
  • JP 15854599 A
  • JP 15855099 A
  • JP 15855799 A
  • JP 15856099 A
  • JP 15856799 A
  • JP 19977099 A
  • JP 19977399 A
  • JP 19977999 A
  • JP 20168599 A
  • JP 24954099 A
  • JP 25323299 A
  • JP 19977699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1210880A1] Novel utilization of sucralose which is a high intense sweetener. Compositions containing sucralose including: sweetening compositions having excellent sweetness qualities based on the characteristics of sucralose; foods with a masked unpleasant smell and unpleasant taste; performance food compositions (viscous food compositions, gel food compositions, emulsified food compositions); foods with improved flavors; preservatives and foods with improved quality of taste; and flavor compositions with improved flavors. Novel utilization of sucralose as a sweetness improver, a masking agent for unpleasant smell/unpleasant taste, a flavor improver, a function improver (viscosity, gelling properties, emulsification properties), a taste characteristic improver, and a flavor improver/enhancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/236

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23C 9/13 (2006.01); A23C 9/152 (2006.01); A23C 9/156 (2006.01); A23C 11/04 (2006.01); A23F 3/16 (2006.01); A23F 3/30 (2006.01); A23F 5/24 (2006.01); A23G 3/00 (2006.01); A23G 3/42 (2006.01); A23G 4/00 (2006.01); A23G 4/10 (2006.01); A23G 9/32 (2006.01); A23G 9/34 (2006.01); A23J 3/00 (2006.01); A23J 3/16 (2006.01); A23J 3/18 (2006.01); A23L 1/236 (2006.01); A23L 1/24 (2006.01); A23L 1/314 (2006.01); A23L 1/32 (2006.01); A23L 2/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23G 3/42 (2013.01); A23C 9/1307 (2013.01); A23C 9/1522 (2013.01); A23C 9/156 (2013.01); A23C 11/04 (2013.01); A23F 3/163 (2013.01); A23F 3/30 (2013.01); A23F 5/243 (2013.01); A23G 4/10 (2013.01); A23G 9/34 (2013.01); A23J 3/04 (2013.01); A23J 3/16 (2013.01); A23J 3/18 (2013.01); A23L 2/60 (2013.01); A23L 13/428 (2016.08); A23L 15/00 (2016.08); A23L 27/37 (2016.08); A23L 27/60 (2016.08); A23L 27/63 (2016.08); A23V 2002/00 (2013.01); Y10S 426/804 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/264 + A23V 2250/28
  2. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/264 + A23V 2250/606
  3. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/264 + A23V 2250/636
  4. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/264 + A23V 2250/262 + A23V 2250/624
  5. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/264 + A23V 2250/606 + A23V 2250/044

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1210880 A1 20020605; EP 1210880 A4 20050311; EP 1210880 A8 20020904; EP 1210880 B1 20081231; EP 1210880 B8 20090603; JP 2010042021 A 20100225; JP 2010227102 A 20101014; JP 2011087599 A 20110506; JP 2011097949 A 20110519; JP 2012165759 A 20120906; JP 2013066490 A 20130418; JP 2013074895 A 20130425; JP 2014057604 A 20140403; JP 2014057605 A 20140403; JP 2014100146 A 20140605; JP 2015126749 A 20150709; JP 2015126750 A 20150709; JP 2015130893 A 20150723; JP 2015144611 A 20150813; JP 2015154781 A 20150827; JP 2015164428 A 20150917; JP 2017205133 A 20171124; JP 2018019707 A 20180208; JP 2018121638 A 20180809; JP 4540231 B2 20100908; JP 4964326 B2 20120627; JP 5072934 B2 20121114; JP 5663550 B2 20150204; JP 5663551 B2 20150204; JP 5813791 B2 20151117; JP 5992728 B2 20160914; JP 6014197 B2 20161025; JP 6053856 B2 20161227; JP 6053857 B2 20161227; JP 6087384 B2 20170301; JP 6278359 B2 20180214; JP 6292599 B2 20180314; JP 6356327 B2 20180711; US 2007212460 A1 20070913; US 7229658 B1 20070612; WO 0024273 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940221

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-12-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: INOUE, MAKI

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: IWAI, KAZUMI

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: OJIMA, NAOTO

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KAWAI, TAKUYA

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KAWAMOTO, MITSUMI

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KURIBI, SHUNSUKE

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SAKAGUCHI, MIHO

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SASAKI, CHIE

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIZU, KAZUHITO

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SHINGURYOU, MARIKO

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: HIRAO, KAZUTAKA

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: FUJII, MIKI

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MORITA, YOSHITO

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: YASUNAMI, NOBUHARU

2009-04-08 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIFUJI, JUNKO

2009-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940221 P 20090212

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-04-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 1/236 A

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23C 9/13 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23G 3/00 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 2/60 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23J 3/16 B

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB