EP 1210992 A3 20040506 - Device for measuring the contour of a roll in a rolling stand
Title (en)
Device for measuring the contour of a roll in a rolling stand
Title (de)
Konturmesseinrichtung zur Messung der Kontur einer in einem Walzengerüst angeordneten Walze
Title (fr)
Dispositif pour mesurer le contour d'un cylindre dans une cage de laminoir
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10059321 A 20001129
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1210992A2] Contour measuring device (16) has a number of measuring heads (18) which travel along a longitudinal axis (24) directed parallel to a roller axis (12). Each head is structured to keep a prescribed distance from the surface of the roller. Preferred Features: At least two measuring heads are provided. The heads each comprise a sensor finger arranged in a housing and having a gas outlet on its outer end to produce an air cushion. A measuring system (70) is also provided for determining the position of each head relative to a fixed point of the roll stand (1).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B21B 38/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B21B 38/12 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [YA] EP 0127263 A2 19841205 - BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]
- [A] DE 3247697 A1 19840620 - ALUSUISSE [CH]
- [DA] EP 0779113 A1 19970618 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
- [A] EP 0221785 A2 19870513 - KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]
- [A] DE 19844305 A1 20000330 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 192 (P - 218) 23 August 1983 (1983-08-23)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 239 (P - 391) 25 September 1985 (1985-09-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 548 (M - 1490) 4 October 1993 (1993-10-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1210992 A2 20020605; EP 1210992 A3 20040506; DE 10059321 A1 20020613
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01126265 A 20011106; DE 10059321 A 20001129