Global Patent Index - EP 1211034 A3

EP 1211034 A3 2003-06-11 - Tile press with belt charging devices

Title (en)

Tile press with belt charging devices

Title (de)

Ziegelpresse mit Bandfördereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Presse à tuiles comportant des bandes transporteuses de chargement

Publication

EP 1211034 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01204435 A

Priority

IT MI20002537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1211034A2] Press for pressing tiles (10) comprising a pressing mold (11) into which a charging device (14) dumps powders to be pressed, the charging device (14) comprising a conveyor belt (16) onto which are dumped the powders to be dumped into the mold and which is caused to run over the mold to dump the powders from one of its ends into the mold characterized in that the belt surface for receiving the powder has ridges (23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/0215 (2013.01); B28B 13/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1211034 A2 20020605; EP 1211034 A3 20030611; EP 1211034 B1 20150506; ES 2544227 T3 20150828; IT 1320102 B1 20031118; IT MI20002537 A1 20020524

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160209

2016-02-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60149353

2015-08-28 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2544227 T3

- Effective date: 20150828

2015-06-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60149353

- Effective date: 20150611

2015-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2015-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARAZZI GROUP S.R.L.

2015-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARAZZI GROUP S.R.L.

2014-12-31 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20141204

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARAZZI GROUP S.P.A.

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI