Global Patent Index - EP 1211309 A8

EP 1211309 A8 2002-11-20 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROLIFERATING HEPATITIS VIRUS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROLIFERATING HEPATITIS VIRUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMEHRUNG VON HEPATITISVIREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PROLIFERATION DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE

Publication

EP 1211309 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00953532 A

Priority

  • JP 0005582 W
  • JP 23364799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1211309A1] A method for proliferating a hepatitis virus such as HCV and an apparatus therefor. A method of proliferating cells (for example, hepatocytes), which are less adhesive to a carrier, in a large amount over a long time. More particularly, the above method comprises infecting hepatocytes, which are maintained in a radial flow type hepatocyte bioreactor consisting of a main bioreactor unit containing the hepatocytes carried on a particulate porous carrier and a liquid culture medium flown from the periphery of the main bioreactor unit toward the center thereof, with a hepatitis virus; continuously flowing the liquid culture medium from the periphery of the main bioreactor unit toward the center thereof; and thus proliferating the hepatitis virus in the hepatocytes thus infected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12M 3/00; C12N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/40 (2006.01); C12M 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 3/02 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); C12M 25/16 (2013.01); C12M 41/00 (2013.01); C12N 2770/24251 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1211309 A1 20020605; EP 1211309 A4 20030212; EP 1211309 A8 20021120; JP 4146124 B2 20080903; WO 0114517 A1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PROLIFERATING HEPATITIS VIRUS

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE