Global Patent Index - EP 1211789 A3

EP 1211789 A3 2002-11-13 - Electrical transformer

Title (en)

Electrical transformer

Title (de)

Elektronischer Transformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur éléctrique

Publication

EP 1211789 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01121678 A

Priority

  • DE 10059244 A
  • DE 10065041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1211789A2] A case (2) has a spherical main area (3) and a front part (4) set in a mounting device in front of the main area. The front part has a smaller width than the main area, is flatter than the main area and has ventilation slots (6). Input (7) and output (8) mains power supply connector cables each insert one of their ends into the front part and each link their other end to connector elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/02; H01F 27/02; H01F 27/06; H02M 7/00; H05B 39/00; H05B 41/02; H05K 5/02; F21L 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1211789 A2 20020605; EP 1211789 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 23/02 A, 7H 02M 7/00 B, 7H 05K 5/02 B, 7F 21L 7/00 B, 7H 01F 27/02 B, 7H 01F 27/06 B, 7H 05B 39/00 B, 7H 05B 41/02 B

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DILGE ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI