Global Patent Index - EP 1212201 A4

EP 1212201 A4 2002-11-13 - MULTI LAYER CONTINUOUS PAPER PRINTER

Title (en)

MULTI LAYER CONTINUOUS PAPER PRINTER

Title (de)

DRUCKER FÜR MEHRSCHICHTIGES ENDLOSPAPIER

Title (fr)

IMPRESSION SUR PAPIER EN CONTINU MULTICOUCHES

Publication

EP 1212201 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00954157 A

Priority

  • AU 0000986 W
  • AU PQ228699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0112444A1] A method of printing that enables simultaneous printing multiple paper streams with a combination of fixed and variable information is disclosed. The method is useful in combination with high-speed form collators handling multiple paper streams. The method uses a web based graphics editor program to develop page layout information incorporating fixed and variable image information using a web based graphics editor program. The page layout information is manipulated by an image processing computer, said image processing computer including a digital signal processing system adapted to analyse the page layout information into a pixel data corresponding to fixed and variable information to be printed and dividing the pixel data into a plurality of data packets. The data packets are delivered to a respective print head in a plurality of print head arrays. Each of the print head arrays is associated with a separate paper stream to thereby produce printing on multiple streams simultaneously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/40; B41J 3/62; G06F 3/12; G06K 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 21/00 (2006.01); B41J 29/40 (2006.01); G06F 3/12 (2006.01); G06K 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 15/02 (2013.01); B41J 29/40 (2013.01); G06K 2215/0014 (2013.01); G06K 2215/0077 (2013.01); G06K 2215/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0112444 A1 20010222; AU PQ228699 A0 19990909; CN 1376116 A 20021023; EP 1212201 A1 20020612; EP 1212201 A4 20021113; IL 148204 D0 20020912; JP 2004516162 A 20040603; NZ 517389 A 20030926

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040416

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUSUMECI, PHILLIP

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEWITT, GARY

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUSUMECI, PHILLIP

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEWITT, GARY

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 29/40 A, 7B 41J 3/62 B, 7G 06F 3/12 B, 7G 06K 15/02 B

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020226;LT PAYMENT 20020226;LV PAYMENT 20020226;MK PAYMENT 20020226;RO PAYMENT 20020226;SI PAYMENT 20020226