Global Patent Index - EP 1212341 A4

EP 1212341 A4 2002-11-27 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND POLYPEPTIDES ENCODED THEREBY DISTANTLY HOMOLOGOUS TO HEPARANASE

Title (en)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND POLYPEPTIDES ENCODED THEREBY DISTANTLY HOMOLOGOUS TO HEPARANASE

Title (de)

POLYNUKLEOTIDE UND DAVON KODIERTE POLYPEPTIDE DIE ENTFERNTE HOMOLOGE VON HEPARANASE SIND

Title (fr)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES ET POLYPEPTIDES HOMOLOGUES LOINTAINS DE L'HEPARANASE CODES PAR CES POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Publication

EP 1212341 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00937164 A

Priority

  • IL 0000358 W
  • US 14080199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0100643A3] Novel polynucleotides encoding polypeptides distantly homologous to heparanase, nucleic acid constructs including the polynucleotides, genetically modified cells expressing same, recombinant proteins encoded thereby and which may have heparanase or other glycosyl hydrolase activity, antibodies recognizing the recombinant proteins, oligonucleotides and oligonucleotide analogs derived from the polynucleotides and ribozymes including same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C07K 5/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 1/20; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Y 302/01166 (2013.01); C12N 9/2402 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9921975 A1 19990506 - UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al
  • [PX] WO 9957153 A1 19991111 - INSIGHT STRATEGY & MARKETING [IL], et al
  • [XD] DATABASE EMBL [online] 28 October 1998 (1998-10-28), "qg97h02.x1 Soares_NFL_T_GBC_S1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:1843155 3', mRNA sequence", XP002215097, Database accession no. AI222323
  • [A] VLODAVSKY I ET AL: "Expression of heparanase by platelets and circulating cells of the immune system: Possible involvement in diapedesis and extravasation.", INVASION & METASTASIS, vol. 12, no. 2, 1992, pages 112 - 127, XP001106180, ISSN: 0251-1789
  • See also references of WO 0100643A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0100643 A2 20010104; WO 0100643 A3 20050224; AU 5244800 A 20010131; AU 777343 B2 20041014; CA 2377498 A1 20010104; CN 1370178 A 20020918; EP 1212341 A1 20020612; EP 1212341 A4 20021127; HU 0300901 A2 20030728; IL 146527 D0 20020725; JP 2003503070 A 20030128; KR 20020028906 A 20020417; MX PA01011708 A 20030910; NO 20015526 A 20011218; NO 20015526 D0 20011112; PL 362599 A1 20041102

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSIGHT BIOPHARMACEUTICALS LTD.

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-04-13 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI