EP 1212453 A4 20030226 - METHOD TO IDENTIFY GENE FUNCTION USING SMALL MOLECULE PROBES
Title (en)
METHOD TO IDENTIFY GENE FUNCTION USING SMALL MOLECULE PROBES
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON GENFUNKTIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG KLEINER MOLEKÜLSONDEN
Title (fr)
TECHNIQUE D'IDENTIFICATION DE FONCTION DE GENE PAR L'UTILISATION DE PETITES SONDES MOLECULAIRES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0024124 W 20000901
- US 15247199 P 19990903
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0118234A1] Methods for identifying genes which bind to natural products and other small molecules using a phage display system are described. Phage displaying protein which binds the target molecule are selected by affinity chromatography using a solid support to which a small molecule non-peptide bait is coupled. The selectively bound phage can then be amplified and the DNA inserts encoding the binding protein sequenced. The specifically bound protein is then useful to screen for therapeutic candidates which can then be used to treat conditions modulated by the target protein.
IPC 1-7
C12Q 1/00; C12Q 1/70; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/543; C12N 7/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/10
IPC 8 full level
A61K 31/424 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/22 (2006.01); C07K 14/005 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/6809 (2018.01); C40B 40/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61P 43/00 (2017.12); C12N 15/1037 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6809 (2013.01); C40B 40/02 (2013.01); G01N 33/543 (2013.01); G01N 33/6842 (2013.01); G01N 2500/04 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 5766905 A 19980616 - STUDIER F WILLIAM [US], et al
- [X] WO 9837885 A1 19980903 - GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]
- [X] US 5620971 A 19970415 - ARMISTEAD DAVID M [US], et al
- [PXY] BORMAN ET AL: "PROTEIN TARGETS OF BIOACTIVE NATURAL PRODUCTS PROBED", CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING NEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, vol. 77, no. 40, 4 October 1999 (1999-10-04), pages 33 - 34, XP002944224, ISSN: 0009-2347
- [XY] POPE A ET AL: "In vitro selection of a high affinity antibody to oestradiol using a phage display human antibody library", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, vol. 2, no. 3, 1 September 1996 (1996-09-01), pages 209 - 217, XP004070295, ISSN: 1380-2933
- [XY] CLACKSON T ET AL: "IN VITRO SELECTION FROM PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE LIBRARIES", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, GB, vol. 12, 1 May 1994 (1994-05-01), pages 173 - 184, XP000619299, ISSN: 0167-7799
- [XY] HAWKINS R E ET AL: "SELECTION OF PHAGE ANTIBODIES BY BINDING AFFINITY MIMICKING AFFINITY MATURATION", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 226, no. 3, 1992, pages 889 - 896, XP000940994, ISSN: 0022-2836
- [X] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1997, GOLD BRUCE G ET AL: "A non-immunosuppressant FKBP-12 ligand increases nerve regeneration.", XP002223684, Database accession no. PREV199799818647 & EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, vol. 147, no. 2, 1997, pages 269 - 278, ISSN: 0014-4886
- See references of WO 0118234A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0118234 A1 20010315; AU 7343700 A 20010410; AU 784501 B2 20060413; CA 2383186 A1 20010315; EP 1212453 A1 20020612; EP 1212453 A4 20030226; JP 2003508078 A 20030304
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0024124 W 20000901; AU 7343700 A 20000901; CA 2383186 A 20000901; EP 00961492 A 20000901; JP 2001521769 A 20000901