Global Patent Index - EP 1213344 A3

EP 1213344 A3 2003-06-04 - Cleaning or rinse composition for automatic dishwashing machines with odour absorbing component

Title (en)

Cleaning or rinse composition for automatic dishwashing machines with odour absorbing component

Title (de)

Maschinelle Geschirrspülmittel und Klarspüler mit Geruchsabsorber

Title (fr)

Composition de lavage ou de rinçage de vaiselle à la machine contenant un agent détruisant les mauvaises odeurs

Publication

EP 1213344 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01128078 A

Priority

DE 10060533 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1213344A2] Use is claimed in machine dishwasher agents (especially those used in the rinsing stage) of non-alkali metal salts (I) of optionally unsaturated, mono- or poly-hydroxylated >= 8C fatty acids and/or of resin acids. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) Rinsing agents containing (I). (2) Particulate rinsing agents comprising by wt. (I) (0.1-70%), together with: (a) carrier (0-65%), (b) covering material of melting point above 50[deg]C (30-70%), (c) fat(s) (0-65%) and (d) further active agents or aids (0-50%). (3) Builder-containing shaped bodies containing (I) at 0.5-60 (especially 5-30) wt.%. (4) Multi-phase shaped bodies composed as in (2). (5) A container which is hung in the dishwasher and which is (at least on one side) permeable to a composition containing (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; C11D 17/00; C11D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 3/0068 (2013.01); C11D 3/2079 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1213344 A2 20020612; EP 1213344 A3 20030604; DE 10060533 A1 20020620

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI