Global Patent Index - EP 1213480 A3

EP 1213480 A3 2004-12-08 - Internal gear hydraulic machine

Title (en)

Internal gear hydraulic machine

Title (de)

Hydraulische Maschine in Zahnring-Bauweise

Title (fr)

Machine hydraulique à engrenages internes

Publication

EP 1213480 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01125325 A

Priority

  • DE 19630975 A
  • DE 19631910 A
  • EP 97112992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1213480A2] The hydraulic machine has a casing (2) containing a rotor (5) round which is a ring (7) with internal teeth (8) engaged with rotor teeth (6), forming working chambers between the teeth. It includes two pressure control devices (54, 54.1, 54.2, 54.3, 54.4, 54.A) which are connected in parallel and which control different pressure differences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/00; F04C 2/08; F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0042 (2013.01); F04C 2/103 (2013.01); F04C 15/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1213480 A2 20020612; EP 1213480 A3 20041208; SI 0822333 T1 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060725

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050606

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 15/00 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 2/10 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 2/08 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 15/00 A

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 2/10 B

2002-06-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 822333

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI