Global Patent Index - EP 1213633 B9

EP 1213633 B9 2007-10-17 - EDITOR DEVICE AND RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH EDITOR PROGRAM IS RECORDED

Title (en)

EDITOR DEVICE AND RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH EDITOR PROGRAM IS RECORDED

Title (de)

EDITIERVORRICHTUNG UND AUFNAHMEMEDIUM AUF DEM DAS EDITIERPROGRAMM AUFGEZEICHNET WIRD

Title (fr)

EDITEUR ET SUPPORT ENREGISTRE SUR LEQUEL LE PROGRAMME D'EDITION EST ENREGISTRE

Publication

EP 1213633 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 00955074 A

Priority

  • JP 0005803 W
  • JP 24640299 A
  • JP 24640799 A
  • JP 24641799 A
  • JP 24644599 A
  • JP 24922199 A
  • JP 24922799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1213633A1] A procedure (user program) in which a PLC 2 controls operation of input-output apparatuses (4) is generated on a ladder window by using a ladder editor (32a). A screen (user screen) on which a programmable display apparatus (1) displays states of the input-output apparatuses (4) is generated on a screen generating window by a screen generating editor (32b). For example, when a symbol on a ladder diagram on the ladder window next to the screen generating window is dragged and dropped onto the screen generating window, attribute data including a name and address of the input-output apparatus that relates to the symbol is copied from a ladder file (33a) for registering the user program to a screen file (33b) for registering the user screen, and a mark corresponding to the attribute data is displayed on the screen generating window. This eliminates a need of a common database for registering the attribute data. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/056 (2013.01); G05B 19/05 (2013.01); G05B 2219/1104 (2013.01); G05B 2219/13048 (2013.01); G05B 2219/13052 (2013.01); G05B 2219/13144 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1213633 A1 20020612; EP 1213633 A4 20040526; EP 1213633 B1 20070613; EP 1213633 B9 20071017; AU 6732900 A 20010326; CN 100368986 C 20080213; CN 100368987 C 20080213; CN 100368988 C 20080213; CN 1160601 C 20040804; CN 1302375 C 20070228; CN 1371488 A 20020925; CN 1515968 A 20040728; CN 1515969 A 20040728; CN 1515970 A 20040728; CN 1523464 A 20040825; DE 60035202 D1 20070726; DE 60035202 T2 20080214; DE 60045196 D1 20101216; EP 1816531 A2 20070808; EP 1816531 A3 20071226; EP 1816532 A2 20070808; EP 1816532 A3 20071226; EP 1821166 A2 20070822; EP 1821166 A3 20071226; EP 1821166 B1 20101103; US 7603183 B1 20091013; WO 0116657 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141128

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60035202 P 20070726

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUNEMOTO, KENICHI

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOSHIDA, MINORU

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TANIGAWA, SHUNU

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OHTOMO, TAKAO

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORIYAMA, TOSHIHIKO

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060314

2004-05-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI