Global Patent Index - EP 1214864 B1

EP 1214864 B1 2003-06-04 - SILICON-BASED SENSOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

SILICON-BASED SENSOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

SILIKON BASIERTE SENSOR-SYSTEME

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CAPTEUR A BASE DE SILICIUM

Publication

EP 1214864 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00958265 A

Priority

  • DK 0000491 W
  • DK PA199901254 A
  • US 39162899 A
  • US 57043400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0119134A2] The present invention relates to solid state silicon-based condenser microphone systems suitable for batch production. The combination of the different elements forming the microphone system is more flexible compared to any other system disclosed in the prior art. Electrical connections between the different elements of the microphone system are established economically and reliably via a silicon carrier using flip-chip technology. The invention uses an integrated electronic circuit chip, preferably an application specific integrated circuit (ASIC) which may be designed and manufactured separately and independent of the design and manufacture of the transducer element of the microphone. The complete sensor system can be electrically connected to an external substrate by surface mount technology with the contacts facing one side of the system that is not in conflict with the above-mentioned interface to the environment. This allows the user to apply simple and efficient surface mount techniques for the assembly of the overall system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 19/00 (2006.01); H04R 19/04 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 19/005 (2013.01); H04R 19/04 (2013.01); H04R 25/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0119134 A2 20010315; WO 0119134 A3 20010907; AT 242587 T 20030615; AU 6984100 A 20010410; CA 2383740 A1 20010315; CA 2383740 C 20050405; CN 1203726 C 20050525; CN 1387741 A 20021225; DE 60003199 D1 20030710; DE 60003199 T2 20040701; DK 1214864 T3 20030825; EP 1214864 A2 20020619; EP 1214864 B1 20030604; JP 2003508998 A 20030304; JP 2007028671 A 20070201; JP 4303742 B2 20090729; JP 4459498 B2 20100428; PL 209935 B1 20111130; PL 354095 A1 20031229

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: TDK CORPORATION, JP

- Document: AT 242587 T

- Effective date: 20171020

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170324 AND 20170330

2017-03-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TDK CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20170203

2017-02-22 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: TDK CORPORATION; JP

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: EPCOS PTE LTD

- Effective date: 20170206

2017-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TDK CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EPCOS PTE LTD, SG

2017-02-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TDK CORP., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EPCOS PTE LTD, SINGAPORE, SG

- Document: DE 60003199

2017-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60003199

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2017-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60003199

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHA, DE

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: EPCOS PTE LTD, SG

- Effective date: 20130503

2013-06-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: EPCOS PTE LTD, SG

- Effective date: 20130503

2013-04-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130314 AND 20130320

2013-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: EPCOS PTE LTD, SG

- Document: AT 242587 T

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-12-05 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121129

2011-06-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EPCOS PTE LTD, SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SONIONMEMS A/S, LYNGBY, DK

- Document: DE 60003199

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-06-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TDK CORP., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SONIONMEMS A/S, LYNGBY, DK

- Document: DE 60003199

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PULSE MEMS A/S

- Free text: SONIONMEMS A/S#CAT/DTU, BYGNING 347#2800 KONGENS LYNGBY (DK) -TRANSFER TO- PULSE MEMS A/S#CAT/DTU, BYGNING 347#2800 KONGENS LYNGBY (DK)

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PULSE MEMS AP/S

- Free text: PULSE MEMS A/S#CAT/DTU, BYGNING 347#2800 KONGENS LYNGBY (DK) -TRANSFER TO- PULSE MEMS AP/S#CAT/DTU, BYGNING 347#2800 KONGENS LYNGBY (DK)

2011-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: EPCOS PTE LTD

- Free text: PULSE MEMS AP/S#CAT/DTU, BYGNING 347#2800 KONGENS LYNGBY (DK) -TRANSFER TO- EPCOS PTE LTD#166 KALLANG WAY#349249 SINGAPORE (SG)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-09-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-09-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003199 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONIONMEMS A/S

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI