EP 1215050 A4 20030326 - DRIVING IC AND OPTICAL PRINT HEAD
Title (en)
DRIVING IC AND OPTICAL PRINT HEAD
Title (de)
INTEGRIERTE TREIBERSCHALTUNG UND OPTISCHER DRUCKKOPF
Title (fr)
CIRCUIT INTEGRE PILOTE ET TETE D'IMPRESSION OPTIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 0006333 W 20000914
- JP 26590499 A 19990920
- JP 29406999 A 19991015
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1215050A1] An optical print head has a light-emitting device 22 having n individual electrodes 28, p common electrodes 27, and a plurality of (n x p) light-emitting parts 26 selected by those individual and common electrodes and a driving IC 1 having individual electrodes and m group-selecting terminals CD1 to CD40. A plurality of (q) light-emitting devices 22 are provided for one driving IC 1, and the number (q) of light-emitting devices 22 is determined by the number (p) of common electrodes 27 provided on each light-emitting device 22 and the number (m) of the group-selecting terminals CD provided on the driving IC 1. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/45 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/45 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5307089 A 19940426 - TAKASU HIROMI [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0744298 A2 19961127 - CANON KK [JP]
- [E] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 21 3 August 2001 (2001-08-03)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 385 (M - 651) 16 December 1987 (1987-12-16)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)
- See references of WO 0121411A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE LI NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1215050 A1 20020619; EP 1215050 A4 20030326; CN 1374906 A 20021016; HK 1048968 A1 20030425; WO 0121411 A1 20010329
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00961037 A 20000914; CN 00813100 A 20000914; HK 03101154 A 20030218; JP 0006333 W 20000914