Global Patent Index - EP 1215115 A3

EP 1215115 A3 2003-06-18 - Bow thruster retrofit kit and quick fit mounting therefor

Title (en)

Bow thruster retrofit kit and quick fit mounting therefor

Title (de)

Bugstrahlruder-Nachrüstsatz und Schnellbefestigungsbeschlag hierfür

Title (fr)

Lot de rattrapage de gouvernail d'étrave et ferrure d'assemblage rapide correspondante

Publication

EP 1215115 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01126649 A

Priority

AT 89300 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1215115A2] Bow thruster retrofit kit for a water vehicle with a hull comprises a combination of a conventional outboard motor consisting of a shaft (4) and a propeller (5), and a quick-fixing device (9a-c) for removably fixing the shaft on the side of the bow of the hull in a position in which the propeller lies approximately at a right angle to the longitudinal plane of the hull and under the keel line of the hull. An Independent claim is also included for a quick-fixing device for an outboard motor with a shaft and propeller. Preferred Features: The quick-fixing device comprises a first part (9a) fixed to the side of the hull, and a second part (9b) mounted on the shaft and interacting with the first part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 25/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/02 (2006.01); B63H 25/42 (2006.01); B63H 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/02 (2013.01); B63H 25/42 (2013.01); B63H 20/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1215115 A2 20020619; EP 1215115 A3 20030618; AT 4847 U1 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI