Global Patent Index - EP 1215116 A3

EP 1215116 A3 2002-09-25 - Parachute deployment system

Title (en)

Parachute deployment system

Title (de)

Fallschirmöffnungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ouverture d'un parachute

Publication

EP 1215116 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01310129 A

Priority

GB 0030396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1215116A2] A parachute has a canopy (10) and rigging lines (11) with skirt assist lines (15) connected between a point on each rigging line (11) adjacent a lower edge (12) of the canopy (10) and a point on the interior of the canopy (10) spaced from the lower edge (12). The arrangement is such that a portion of the canopy (10) between the point and the lower edge (12) is relieved of tension as the canopy (10) is deployed to assist the opening of the canopy (10). The skirt assist lines (15) are frangible. This prevents rapid deployment of the canopy to lower g-forces on the load in high speed opening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64D 17/62; B64D 17/14; B64D 17/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 17/36 (2006.01); B64D 17/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64D 17/36 (2013.01); B64D 17/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1215116 A2 20020619; EP 1215116 A3 20020925; EP 1215116 B1 20050601; EP 1215116 B8 20050727; DE 60111168 D1 20050707; DE 60111168 T2 20051110; ES 2239653 T3 20051001; GB 0030396 D0 20010124; GB 2370022 A 20020619; GB 2370022 B 20041222; US 2002092952 A1 20020718; US 2004065782 A1 20040408; US 6769650 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGRI ES] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Effective date: 20120517

2012-05-29 [REG ES NF2A] RESTORATION AFTER LAPSE (ACC. PAR. 117)

- Effective date: 20120517

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20091205

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-06-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110607

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239653 T3

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60111168 P 20050707

2005-06-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIRBORNE SYSTEMS LIMITED

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SURVITEC GROUP LIMITED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 64D 17/62 A, 7B 64D 17/14 B, 7B 64D 17/36 B

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI