Global Patent Index - EP 1215300 A3

EP 1215300 A3 20031008 - Scraper for hot dip coating method

Title (en)

Scraper for hot dip coating method

Title (de)

Abstreifer für Schmelztauchverfahren

Title (fr)

Racleur pour procédé de métallisation au trempé

Publication

EP 1215300 A3 20031008 (DE)

Application

EP 01128698 A 20011201

Priority

  • DE 10061869 A 20001212
  • DE 10128710 A 20010613

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1215300A2] Skimming molten metal (5) from objects comprises immersing the object into a molten metal; moving the object upward from the melt; accelerating a melt stream flowing downward onto the object in an opposite direction to the upward direction of the object; and blasting the melt stream against the object. An independent claim is also included for a device for skimming molten metal from an object comprising inductors (2, 3), in which at least one inductor is immersed in the melt. Preferred Features: The melt stream is passed through a flow gap. The speed of the melt stream in the gap is regulated using different air gaps.

IPC 1-7

C23C 2/24; C23C 2/20

IPC 8 full level

C23C 2/24 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C23C 2/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 2364904 A 19441212 - KELLER JOHN D
  • [A] US 2377632 A 19450605 - KELLER JOHN D
  • [A] EP 0038036 A1 19811021 - BETHLEHEM STEEL CORP [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 562 (C - 0788) 13 December 1990 (1990-12-13)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 136 (C - 347) 20 May 1986 (1986-05-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 069 (C - 011) 22 May 1980 (1980-05-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 285 (C - 1206) 31 May 1994 (1994-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 037 (C - 1019) 25 January 1993 (1993-01-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1215300 A2 20020619; EP 1215300 A3 20031008; EP 1215300 B1 20060510; AT 325904 T 20060615; DE 50109747 D1 20060614

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 01128698 A 20011201; AT 01128698 T 20011201; DE 50109747 T 20011201