EP 1215541 A3 20060208 - Ventilated cleaning blade for fixing station in an image forming apparatus
Title (en)
Ventilated cleaning blade for fixing station in an image forming apparatus
Title (de)
Belüftete Abstreiferbaugruppe für eine Fixierstation in einer Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung
Title (fr)
Lame de nettoyage ventilée pour un poste de fixage d'un dispositif de formation d'images
Publication
Application
Priority
US 73665600 A 20001213
Abstract (en)
[origin: CA2363450A1] This invention provides a fuser station with a vented skive assembly for an image-forming machine. The image-forming machine may have a photoconductor, a primary charger, an exposure machine, a toning station, a transfer charger, and a vented fuser station. The fuser station may include a pressure roller, a fus er roller, and a skive assembly. The skive assembly has rib sections forming one or mor e slots, which are configured to provide an airflow pattern to reduce condensation. T he skive assembly may have an insert protection device disposed in one or more of the slots.
IPC 8 full level
G03G 15/20 (2006.01); B65H 5/38 (2006.01); F16C 13/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G03G 15/2028 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 125 (P - 1331) 30 March 1992 (1992-03-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 406 (P - 930) 8 September 1989 (1989-09-08)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 086 (E - 125) 24 July 1979 (1979-07-24)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 173 (P - 469) 18 June 1986 (1986-06-18)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1215541 A2 20020619; EP 1215541 A3 20060208; CA 2363450 A1 20020613; CA 2363450 C 20050503; DE 10159791 A1 20020725; JP 2002304071 A 20021018; US 2002071699 A1 20020613; US 6564030 B2 20030513
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01128428 A 20011205; CA 2363450 A 20011115; DE 10159791 A 20011205; JP 2001377321 A 20011211; US 73665600 A 20001213