Global Patent Index - EP 1215649 A3

EP 1215649 A3 2002-11-27 - Plasma display panel

Title (en)

Plasma display panel

Title (de)

Plasmabildschirm

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage au plasma

Publication

EP 1215649 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01000718 A

Priority

DE 10061722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002070907A1] The present invention relates to an arrangement including a plasma display screen (3). In such an arrangement having cells for the generation of pixels between a transparent front plate (10) facing the viewer and a rear wall (11) and having electrical contacts for contacting the cells in the areas (13) of opposite outer edges of the rear wall (11), which contacts are connected to electronic circuits (4, 6, 7), arranged on the outer side of the rear wall (11) remote from the cells, by means of current supply leads (2) which extend substantially parallel, in such a manner that the current supply leads (2) end, electrically isolated, in a narrow contact area (14), where electrical contact is established between the current supply leads (2), on the one hand, and the electrical circuits (4, 6, 7), on the other hand.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/66 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/296 (2013.01); H01J 17/18 (2006.01); H01J 17/34 (2006.01); H01J 17/49 (2006.01); H05K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/296 (2013.01); G09G 2330/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5952986 A 19990914 - NHAN NGUYEN THANH [JP], et al
  • [XY] YAMAMOTO T ET AL: "A 40-IN.-DIAGONAL HDTV PLASMA DISPLAY", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM - DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. SEATTLE, MAY 16 - 21, 1993, PLAYA DEL REY, SID, US, vol. 1 VOL. 24, 16 May 1993 (1993-05-16), pages 165 - 168, XP000470753, ISSN: 0097-966X
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 05 14 September 2000 (2000-09-14)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 05 31 May 1999 (1999-05-31)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1215649 A2 20020619; EP 1215649 A3 20021127; EP 1215649 B1 20060913; CN 1365133 A 20020821; DE 10061722 A1 20020613; DE 50110998 D1 20061026; JP 2002278468 A 20020927; KR 20020046216 A 20020620; TW 538396 B 20030621; US 2002070907 A1 20020613; US 6753653 B2 20040622

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110998 P 20061026

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI