Global Patent Index - EP 1215695 A3

EP 1215695 A3 2002-09-25 - Movable contact support for mounting contactlevers for low voltage circuit breakers

Title (en)

Movable contact support for mounting contactlevers for low voltage circuit breakers

Title (de)

Bewegbarer Kontaktträger zur Aufnahme von Kontakthebeln für Niederspannungs-Leistungsschalter

Title (fr)

Support de contact mobile pour le montage de leviers de contact de disjoncteur basse tension

Publication

EP 1215695 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01250383 A

Priority

DE 10062761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1215695A2] The contact carrier is swivellably mounted by side bearing arms for ON and OFF switching. It consists of a plastics body with metal strengthening elements (18) embedded in plastics for improving the mechanical strength.The metal strengthening elements are metal lateral parts, in the lateral bearing arms of the contact carrier. The metal strengthening elements are typically in the form of an interconnected metal skeleton for the contact carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00; H01H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/22 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/226 (2013.01); H01H 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1215695 A2 20020619; EP 1215695 A3 20020925; EP 1215695 B1 20090311; DE 10062761 A1 20020620; DE 50114753 D1 20090423

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114753 P 20090423

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI