Global Patent Index - EP 1215964 A4

EP 1215964 A4 2002-11-05 - SHEEP POUR-ON

Title (en)

SHEEP POUR-ON

Title (de)

POUR-ON-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SCHAFE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT CUTANE PAR DEVERSEMENT POUR MOUTON

Publication

EP 1215964 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00963179 A

Priority

  • NZ 0000185 W
  • NZ 33795299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0120994A1] A stable pour-on formulation for treatment of both internal and external parasites of sheep. The active is an avermectin or milbemycin. The formulation is designed to rapidly penetrate the fleece to provide a measurable therapeutic blood level of the active. It includes benzyl alcohol as a solvent, butyl dioxitol as a penetrating agent, and a spreading agent such as a crodamol GTCC and dowanol DPM.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/90 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 43/90 + A01N 25/02
  2. A01N 43/90 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0120994 A1 20010329; AU 733095 B3 20010503; AU 7463000 A 20010424; EP 1215964 A1 20020626; EP 1215964 A4 20021105; ZA 200202557 B 20020828

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060103

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-11-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI