Global Patent Index - EP 1216142 A4

EP 1216142 A4 2003-06-11 - THERMOFORMABLE OPHTHALMIC LENS

Title (en)

THERMOFORMABLE OPHTHALMIC LENS

Title (de)

THERMOFORMBARE OPHTHALMISCHE LINSE

Title (fr)

LENTILLE OPHTHALMIQUE THERMOFORMABLE

Publication

EP 1216142 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00947389 A

Priority

  • US 0019287 W
  • US 14444599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0105578A1] A melt processable hydrogel block copolymer is made from hydrophilic and hydrophobic monomers and has sufficient internal association without crosslinking to provide a dimensionally stable hydrogel at temperatures up to at least about 60 DEG C. The polymer may be thermally processed into an ophthalmic device, and then hydrated into a hydrogel material. Optionally, the polymer may undergo treatment before, during or after hydration to form crosslinks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 11/00; A45C 13/10; A61F 2/16; C08F 220/20; C08F 226/06; C08L 51/00; C08L 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/04 (2006.01); B29D 11/00 (2006.01); C08F 8/00 (2006.01); C08F 220/24 (2006.01); C08F 220/38 (2006.01); C08F 220/56 (2006.01); C08F 290/14 (2006.01); C08J 3/075 (2006.01); G02B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/56 (2013.01); B29D 11/00442 (2013.01); G02B 1/043 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 220/56 + C08F 220/56 + C08F 220/38
  2. C08F 220/56 + C08F 220/24
  3. C08F 220/56 + C08F 220/38

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0105578 A1 20010125; AU 6100700 A 20010205; CA 2379385 A1 20010125; EP 1216142 A1 20020626; EP 1216142 A4 20030611; JP 2003504503 A 20030204; NO 20020216 A 20020307; NO 20020216 D0 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070201

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI