Global Patent Index - EP 1216771 A9

EP 1216771 A9 2002-11-20 - Inserted core for producing a casting mould and process for the production of such casting mould

Title (en)

Inserted core for producing a casting mould and process for the production of such casting mould

Title (de)

Einlegekern zur Herstellung einer Gussform sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Gussform

Title (fr)

Noyau inséré pour la fabrication d'un moule de fonderie et procédé pour la fabrication d'un tel moule de fonderie

Publication

EP 1216771 A9 (DE)

Application

EP 01122817 A

Priority

DE 10059083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10059083C1] Core consists of metal granules and a binder. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a casting mold comprising preparing a mold from coated sand in a sintering process, filling the sand mold with a mixture of metal granules and binder, breaking the core from the mold after hardening, placing the core in the base core made of quartz sand, placing and/or positioning a water casing core on the base core; and building up the residual sand cores produced in the sintering process. Preferred Features: The metal granules are made of high grade steel, copper or brass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/10 (2013.01); B22C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10059083 C1 20020124; EP 1216771 A2 20020626; EP 1216771 A3 20061004; EP 1216771 A9 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170401

2010-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AG

2008-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070404

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22C 1/00 20060101AFI20060830BHEP

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI