Global Patent Index - EP 1216792 A8

EP 1216792 A8 2002-12-04 - Belt conveyor for feeding sheets of glass on a grinding machine, and grinding machine comprising such a conveyor

Title (en)

Belt conveyor for feeding sheets of glass on a grinding machine, and grinding machine comprising such a conveyor

Title (de)

Bandförderer zum Zuführen von Glasscheiben auf einer Schleifmaschine und damit ausgerüstete Schleifmaschine

Title (fr)

Bande transporteuse pour charger des panneaux de verre sur une rectifieuse et rectifieuse ainsi équipée

Publication

EP 1216792 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 01130125 A

Priority

IT TO20001180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1216792A2] On a machine (1) for grinding sheets of glass, a sheet (2) of glass for grinding is fed along a grinding path (P) by a belt conveyor (9) having a supporting structure (10), and a single powered toothed belt (14) defined by a continuous supporting surface (17) for supporting the sheet (2) of glass; the belt (14) having a retaining device (26) which acts on the surface of the sheet (2) of glass facing the supporting surface (17) to keep the sheet (2) of glass in contact with the supporting surface (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 41/00; B24B 7/24; B24B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/24 (2006.01); B24B 9/10 (2006.01); B24B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/10 (2013.01); B24B 7/24 (2013.01); B24B 41/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1216792 A2 20020626; EP 1216792 A3 20030102; EP 1216792 A8 20021204; IT 1320870 B1 20031210; IT TO20001180 A1 20020619; IT TO20001180 D0 20001219; US 2002121427 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOTTERO S.P.A.

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI