Global Patent Index - EP 1216918 A8

EP 1216918 A8 2002-11-20 - Arrangement in a watercraft for embarking and disembarking floating or submersible articles

Title (en)

Arrangement in a watercraft for embarking and disembarking floating or submersible articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für ein Wasserfahrzeug zum Aufnehmen und Aussetzen von Schwimm- oder Tauchgegenständen

Title (fr)

Arrangement dans une embarcation pour la prise à bord et le largage d'articles flottants ou submersibles

Publication

EP 1216918 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 01130034 A

Priority

DE 20021841 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1216918A2] Device for a water vehicle comprises a transport device (10) at least partly immersed in the water for holding and transporting an object from the water onto the water vehicle and vice versa. The transport device has a working position in which it is at least partly immersed in the water and a resting position in which it is arranged out of the water. Preferred Features: The transport device is telescopic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 27/16; B63B 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/14 (2006.01); B63B 27/16 (2006.01); B63B 27/36 (2006.01); B66C 13/02 (2006.01); B63B 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/14 (2013.01); B63B 27/36 (2013.01); B66C 13/02 (2013.01); B63B 19/08 (2013.01); B63B 2019/086 (2013.01); B63B 2027/141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20021841 U1 20020502; AU 9743101 A 20020627; EP 1216918 A2 20020626; EP 1216918 A3 20020626; EP 1216918 A8 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-06-15 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040702

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDSTAEDT, UWE

2005-03-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041101

2005-03-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-02-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-07 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030601

2004-01-07 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63B 27/16 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63B 27/14 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66C 13/02 B

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GLOECKNER, VOLKER

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINDSTAEDT, UWE

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAUTSTUECK, THOMAS

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI