Global Patent Index - EP 1217123 B1

EP 1217123 B1 2004-12-15 - Roll in particular calender roll

Title (en)

Roll in particular calender roll

Title (de)

Walze, insbesondere Kalanderwalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau, en particulier rouleau pour calandre

Publication

EP 1217123 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01123510 A

Priority

  • DE 10061207 A
  • DE 10108128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002069994A1] A paper processing roll for use in a calender of a paper-making machine which during operation can be exposed to increased temperatures is provided with a heat-treated surface which is produced by hot-grinding or hot-balancing or both.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/37 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01); F16C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0246 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4956 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1217123 A1 20020626; EP 1217123 B1 20041215; JP 2002201584 A 20020719; US 2002069994 A1 20020613; US 7018512 B2 20060328

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-03 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2017-04-05 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20161126

2016-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SHW CASTING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20050915

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-05-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104828

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHW CASTING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104828 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021207

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI