Global Patent Index - EP 1217184 B1

EP 1217184 B1 2003-06-04 - Sound absorbing material, muffler using the sound absorbing material, and method for forming sound absorbing layer thereof

Title (en)

Sound absorbing material, muffler using the sound absorbing material, and method for forming sound absorbing layer thereof

Title (de)

Schallschluckendes Material, Schalldämpfer mit diesem schallschluckenden Material, und Verfahren zur Formung einer schallschluckenden Schicht hierfür

Title (fr)

Matériau absorbant acoustique, silencieux employant ce matériau absorbant acoustique, et procédé de formation d'un couche absorbante pour le silencieux

Publication

EP 1217184 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00127435 A

Priority

EP 00127435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1217184A1] In order to provide a sound absorbing material superior in acid resistance, alkali resistance and sound absorbing quality and a sound absorbing layer using this sound absorbing material, multiple pieces of basalt yarn (1a) obtained by dissolving basalt to be continuous fibers are bundled by a fiber bundling agent to acquire a bundled material (1), and the bundled material (1) is fibrillated to obtain a bulky sound absorbing material (2). Moreover, the sound absorbing material (2) is arranged on the outer periphery of a perforated pipe (4) constituting a muffler to form a sound absorbing layer (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/24 (2013.01); F01N 2310/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5926954 A 19990727 - WOLF JERRY M [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1217184 A1 20020626; EP 1217184 B1 20030604; DE 60003201 D1 20030710; DE 60003201 T2 20031218

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003201 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI