Global Patent Index - EP 1217295 A3

EP 1217295 A3 2002-11-20 - Burner for generating a hot gas

Title (en)

Burner for generating a hot gas

Title (de)

Brenner zur Erzeugung eines Heissgases

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour la génération d'un gaz chaud

Publication

EP 1217295 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01129165 A

Priority

  • DE 10065206 A
  • DE 10120960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1217295A2] The double cone gas turbine burner (10) has a perforated front plate (14). A boundary layer (18') of fuel/air mixture is formed in front of this which forms a flame (20) after ignition. A shear layer boundary (21) prevents periodic release of heat and consequent thermoacoustic instabilities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/16; F23C 7/00; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23C 7/02 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1217295 A2 20020626; EP 1217295 A3 20021120; EP 1217295 B1 20060823; DE 50110801 D1 20061005; US 2002182553 A1 20021205; US 6773257 B2 20040810

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170727 AND 20170802

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110801

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110801 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23R 3/16 A, 7F 23D 14/46 B, 7F 23C 7/00 B

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI