Global Patent Index - EP 1217492 A3

EP 1217492 A3 2002-12-11 - Adjustable pedal for motor-vehicles

Title (en)

Adjustable pedal for motor-vehicles

Title (de)

Einstellbarer Pedalmechanismus für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de pédale réglable pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1217492 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01125112 A

Priority

IT TO20001190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1217492A2] Structure of a pedal for motor vehicles, the position of the pedal (7) being adjustable, consisting of an arm rotatably supported by fixed parts of the motor vehicle, including a footboard, connected at its free end. Said means, adapted to adjust the position of the arm and including a coupling lead-sworm screw (25), being associated to the arm consisting of a hollow body (10) of rectangular plant where an elongated element (15) is located connected to one of the services of the motor vehicle, rotatably integral with it and translatable along its longer axis through means controlled by the driver. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/30 (2008.04); G05G 1/405 (2008.04)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1217492 A2 20020626; EP 1217492 A3 20021211; EP 1217492 B1 20080102; DE 60132165 D1 20080214; DE 60132165 T2 20080529; IT 1321125 B1 20031230; IT TO20001190 A1 20020620; IT TO20001190 D0 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121023

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60132165

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132165 P 20080214

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2007-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SISTEMI COMANDI MECCANICI S.C.M. S.P.A.

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: I.M.A.M. S.P.A.

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI